Maths – Short Cut Trick for Squaring of Numbers

Hello Readers,
Yesterday, we posted a post on “Squaring of the Numbers” contributed by TempleRun aka VT. Today, we are sharing our take on “Shortcut Trick of Squaring of the Numbers”. Hope you like the post!!!



Shortcut 1:

Note: This trick works only with those numbers whose unit digit is 5 i.e 15,25,35,45,55 etc

Example :

35 x 35 = ?


Solution:
This trick works as follows: square first digit of the number: 5 x 5 = 25
Now, multiply second digit of one of the number with (second digit + 1) of the other: 3 x (3 + 1) = 12 So the answer comes : 1225(joining second and first multiplication)

Example :
45 x 45 = ?

Solution:
Square first digit of the number: 5 x 5 = 25
Now, multiply second digit of one of the number with (second digit + 1) of the other: 4 x (4 + 1) = 20 So the answer comes : 2025(joining second and first multiplication)

Shortcut 2 :

Note – Squaring Number For numbers whose unit digit is not 5

Example :
13 x 13 = ?

Solution:
This trick works as follows:

To simplify the problem Just add the unit digit number(3 in this case) to the number(13): 13 + 3 = 16 Now, Subtract the unit digit number(3 in this case) to the number(13 in this case): 13 – 3 = 10 Now, multiply the numbers and add unit digit’s square to them: 16 x 13 + 32 = 169 is the answer!

Example :
23 x 23 = ?

Solution:

So , the square of 23 would be 520 + 9 =529
Example :
89 x 89 = ?
Solution:
Square of 89 would be = 7921
Example :
98 x 98 = ?
Solution:
Square of 98 would be 9600 + 04 = 9604
For the first couple of times this trick would look tricky , but after trying 10-15 random squares of two digit numbers you will find this trick more accurate and correct than traditional multiply.
One of our ardent readers, BhaskarHoney also contributed the short cut trick for Squaring of the number from 1- 10000. We are also sharing it with you. Hope you find it useful!!
Practise as much as you can, so that you  can get a handle of it!!
ALL THE BEST!!