Quant Hacks | Aptitude Tricks Solve it in Seconds (Multiplication)

multiplication-tricks

Quantitative Aptitude is hard in most cases especially in exam like Banks and Insurance. Many Banks exam has two tier examination pattern i.e., Prelims and Mains. Most of them have changed their exam patterns and set a sectional timing of 20 minutes on each section. Quantitative aptitude is important for every exam because proper strategy and enough practice can help you score full marks in this section. There may not be assurance in language section and you may stuck while solving reasoning questions but quants is a scoring subject and assures full marks if the calculation is correct.

So to help you ace the quants and to save your precious time during exam hours Adda247 providing some quant tricks to help aspirants .

Multiplication Techniques

We can start with Base Method 

Tips 1:
Base method near 100
a) When both number Greater than 100
Eg1. 110*115

100 010
100 015

Step1- multiplication of 15*10=150
Step2- cross addition - 110+15 or 115+10= 125
Step3- base is 100 multiplying the step 2 by 100= 12500
step4- add step 1 and step 3= 12500+150= 12650

b) When both number less than 100
Eg2. 93*98

93 -07
98 -02

Step1-Multiplication of (-2*-7)= +14
Step2 -Now add (-2) to 93 or (-7) to 98= 91
Step3- step 2*100= 9100{as Base is 100}
Step4- 9100+14= 9114

c) When one number greater than 100 and other is less than 100
Eg3. 95*105

95 -05
105 005

Step1-Multiplication of (-5*5)= -025
Step2 -Now add (5) to 95 or (-5) to 105= 100
Step3- step 2*100= { Base is 100}
Step4- 10000-25=9975

Tips 2- 
Base near 50

a) When both number Greater than 50
Eg1. 56*57

56 06
57 07

Step1-Multiplication of (6*7)= 42
Step2 -Now add (6) to 57 or (7) to 56= 63
Step3- step 2*50= { Base is 50}= 3150
Step4- addition of step 1+ step3= 3192

b) When both number less than 50
Eg2. 47*49

47 -03
49 -01

Step1-Multiplication of (-3*-1)= 03
Step2 -Now add (-03) to 49 or (-01) to 47= 46
Step3- step 2*50= { Base is 50}= 2300
Step4- addition of step 1+ step3= 2303

c) When one number greater than 50 and other is less than 50
Eg3. 56*46

56 6
46 -4

Step1-Multiplication of (6*-4)= -24
Step2 -Now add (6) to 46 or (-4) to 56= 52
Step3- step 2*50= { Base is 50}= 2600
Step4- addition of step 1+ step3= 2576

Tips3:
Base near 20

28 8
29 9

Step1-Multiplication of (8*9)= 72
Step2 -Now add (8) to 29 or (9) to 28= 37
Step3- step 2*20= { Base is 20}= 740
Step4- addition of step 1+ step3=812

Tips 4:
Multiplication of a number which has 5 in unit place

We Know multiplication of two number ending with 5 gives 25 always
Eg1. 65*35 {Here difference betwen number is 30}


= 3*(6+1) for 1st part 25 comes after it + (6-3)*50

=2125+150=2275

Step1- smaller number*(larger number+1)
Step 2- 25 comes after step1
After step 2
Step3- (subtraction of tens digit)*50

Eg2. 45*55 { here difference between number is 10)
= 4*(5+1) 25+ 50*(5-4)= 2425+50=2475

Eg3. 105*115
=10*(11+1) 25+ 50*(11-10)= 12025+50=12075

Eg 4. 85*105
= 8*11 25+ 2*50=8925

Tips 5:
Sum of Unit digit of two numbers is 10 and Ten's digit of both number is same-

Eg1. 17*13
step 1. tens digit*(
step1. 17*13=1*(1+1)=2
step2.  multiplication of 7*3=21
step3- combine step1 and step 2= 221

Eg2. 12*18= 216
Eg3. 14*16=224
Eg3. 3.1*2.6*1.5=3.1*3.9=12.09

Do it Yourself:

1. 75*75
2. 54*56
3. 34*36
4. 85*85


No comments