Quant Hacks Day – Solve it in Seconds

Quantitative Aptitude is hard in most cases especially in exam like Banks and Insurance. Many Banks exam has two tier examination pattern i.e., Prelims and Mains. Most of them have changed their exam patterns and set a sectional timing of 20 minutes on each section. However Quant is important for every exam because proper strategy and enough practice can help you score full marks in this section. There may not be assurance in language section and you may stuck while solving reasoning questions but quants is a scoring subject and assures full marks if the calculation is correct.
So to help you ace the quants and to save your precious time during exam hours Adda247 providing some quant tricks to help aspirants   
Rule 1. Multiplication by 11

Example 1- 

About Course:

"Did you Know? In this pack you will get All new content we launch in the next 1 months"
 

This is the most recommended and NRA-CET ready Pack!
 
Use Code 'DREAM' to avail at the best price today

This package Includes IBPS PO Study Material -  Subscribe Now

About Bank Mahapack
If you are preparing for more than 1 Banking & Insurance exams then this is the pack we recommend you buy.

It is most cost-effective and you get access to 100% digital content for Bank & Insurance exams on Adda247.

Banking & Insurance Exams Covered in this Pack

Additionally, you can crack any private bank job exam with content in this pack.

 

Bank & Insurance Mahapack Highlights 

  • Structured course content
  • Recorded classes available if you miss any live class
  • Previous Years’ Papers of all upcoming exams.
  • Full Length Mocks based on the latest pattern with detailed solutions (video solutions for certain topics)
  • Topic level knowledge tests
  • Strategy sessions, time management & Preparation tips from the experts

 

Validity: 1 Month

Bank Maha Pack
  1. Unlimited Live Classes & Recorded Video Courses
  2. Unlimited Tests and eBooks
  3. 1 Lakh+ Selections
Validity
  1. 15 Months
  2. 9 Months
  3. 3 Months
  4. 27 Months
  5. 1 Month
8449 563/month
BUY NOW
24*11= 2_addition of (2+4) 4

hundred and ones digit is fixed, tens digit is sum of digits.
a) 2 always in hundred place
b) tens place- addition of digits
c) ones place- 4
Example 2- 


60* 11= 6 in hundred place, addition of digits in tens place, 0 in ones place= 660
Rule 2. Addition of interchange number 

Addition of interchange number= 11*(addition of digits)


Example-
1) 26+62
2) 68+86
Now addition of 26+62 be done
 =11*(2+6)= 88
For 68+86= 11*(6+8)= 11*14=154


3) 97+79+58+85+32+23= 11*[(addition of (9+7)+(5+8)+(3+2)]= 11*(16+13+5)=11*34=374 


multiplication by 11 refer to rule 1
Rule 3.Subtraction of Interchange Number


Subtraction of interchange Number= 9*( difference of digits)


Example- 
1) 26-62
2) 68-86
3) 86-68

Note – sign of a number is according to
For 26-62= 9*(4)=-36 … sign is according to sign with bigger number

For 68-86=9*(2)=-18….sign is according to sign with bigger number
for 86-68= 9*(2)=18…. sign is according to sign with bigger number
for 62-26=9*(4)=36.. sign is according to sign with bigger number


4) 34-43-29+92-68+86-79+97-62+26=9*[ (3-4)+(9-2)+(8-6)+(9-7)+(2-6)]=9 *[ -1+7+2+2-4]=9*6= 54
Rule 4. Combination of  addition and subtraction of  Interchangeable numbers



Eg1- 97+79+62-26+58+85+68-86+32+23=  [97+79, 58+85, 32+23]+[62-26, 68-86]

segregate addition of interchange number and subtraction of interchange number



for  [97+79, 58+85, 32+23]= 11*[(9+7)+(5+8)+(3+2)= 11*(16+13+5)=11*34=374

for [62-26, 68-86]= 9*[(6-2)+(6-8)=9*[4+(-2)]=9*2=18

=374+18= 392



Important- Above two types are used in average example-



Question- Average of 20 numbers is 20, we mistakenly take it as 85 but in actual it is 58. What is average now.




Solution- change in value= -85+58= apply Rule 3= 9*(-8+5)= 9*(-3)= -27


change in value = -27/20= -1.35


change in average= 20-1.35=18.65




Rule 5- Square of numbers with unit digit 5.

(25)^2= 2*(2+1)   25 always at unit place

(35)^2= 3*(3+1) 25 always in unit place =1225

(45)^2= 4*(4+1) 25=2025

(105)^2=11025

This rule is useful for square of numbers of unit digit 5.


Do It Yourself:



1. 44+89-64+78+44-98+46-87
2. 11*88

3. 11*123
4. 75*75