Govt Exams 2019: Quant Hacks | Digital Sum Method

Quantitative Aptitude is hard in most cases especially in exams like Banks and Insurance. Many Banks exam has a two-tier examination pattern i.e., Prelims and Mains. Most of them have changed their exam patterns and set a sectional timing of 20 minutes on each section. Quantitative aptitude is important for every exam because proper strategy and enough practice can help you score full marks in this section. There may not be assured in the language section and you may be stuck while solving reasoning questions but quants is a scoring subject and assure full marks if the calculation is correct.

About Course:

"Did you Know? In this pack you will get All new content we launch in the next 1 months"
 

This is the most recommended and NRA-CET ready Pack!
 
Use Code 'DREAM' to avail at the best price today

This package Includes IBPS PO Study Material -  Subscribe Now

About Bank Mahapack
If you are preparing for more than 1 Banking & Insurance exams then this is the pack we recommend you buy.

It is most cost-effective and you get access to 100% digital content for Bank & Insurance exams on Adda247.

Banking & Insurance Exams Covered in this Pack

Additionally, you can crack any private bank job exam with content in this pack.

 

Bank & Insurance Mahapack Highlights 

  • Structured course content
  • Recorded classes available if you miss any live class
  • Previous Years’ Papers of all upcoming exams.
  • Full Length Mocks based on the latest pattern with detailed solutions (video solutions for certain topics)
  • Topic level knowledge tests
  • Strategy sessions, time management & Preparation tips from the experts

 

Validity: 1 Month

Bank Maha Pack
  1. Unlimited Live Classes & Recorded Video Courses
  2. Unlimited Tests and eBooks
  3. 1 Lakh+ Selections
Validity
  1. 15 Months
  2. 9 Months
  3. 3 Months
  4. 27 Months
  5. 1 Month
6799 453/month
BUY NOW

So to help you ace the quants and to save your precious time during exam hours Adda247 providing some quant tricks to help aspirants.

We are stating with rules of digit- sum method.

Rules of digit-sum method 
This method is also called the nines- remainder method
1. We get the digit-sum of a number by adding across the number. for eg, the digit-sum of 13022 is 1+3+0+2+2=8

2. We always reduce the digit-sum to a single figure. for eg, the digit-sum of 5264 is 5+2+6+4=17

but reduce it to single figure i.e 17 is reduced to a single figure i.e. digit sum of 1+7=8.

3. Note- In adding across a number we may drop out 9, 9 doesn’t count on digit sum.

eg1: digit sum of 9901is (0+1)= 1.
eg2: digit sum of 279 is (2+7+9)= 0 here digit sum of (2,7) makes 9.
4. for decimals we work exactly the same way, but we don’t pay attention to the decimal points.
the digit sum of 6.256 is (6+2+5+6)=19, neglect 9= digit sum is 1
We apply digit sum for addition, subtraction, multiplication, division.
Digit sum plays a crucial role in simplification in option elimination.

For addition-

Eg1. 1.5+32.5+23.9= 57.9
LHS-digit sum(1+5)+ (3+2+5)+(2+3)= 6+10+5=21=3

RHS- 5+7+9= 5+7=12=3
(LHS)= (RHS)
Eg2. 23+48=71
LHS=digit sum(2,3)+(4,8)=5+(12)= 5+3=8
RHS= 7+1=8
LHS=RHS
Eg3. 321+467+2311= 3099
LHS=(3+2+1)+(4+6+7)+(2+3+1+1)= 6+(17)+(7)=6+8+7=21=3
RHS=3+9+9 treated 9 as 0= 3
LHS=RHS
For Subtraction

Eg1. 93-21=72
LHS- digit sum of (9+3)-(3)=3-3=0

RHS-7+2=9 i.e. 0
LHS=RHS
Eg2.- 140-80=60
LHS- (1+4)-(8)= 5-8= -3 when digit sum is negative add 9 in it
here -3+9= 6
RHS- (6+0)=6
LHS=RHS
For Multiplication-

Eg1. 15*13=195
LHS-digit sum of 15 and 13= 6*4=24=6)

RHS- 195= 6
LHS=RHS

Or we can do it by-
15*13= any number has 5 in its unit digit make it to 10 by multiplying by 2 and further divide by 2 to balance.
15*13= (30*13)/2=390/2=195.

Note- digit sum very helpful in long multiplication
 Eg2. 321*132= 42372
LHS- digit sum of 321 is 6 and 132 is 6
6*6=36 i.e 9 we neglect 9= 0
RHS- digit sum of (4+2+3+7+2)=0
LHS=RHS

For Divison 

The rule of digit-sum fails in some cases when the denominator has 3,6,9.


in this case, better is to divide the number first to remove the denominator.

1. 38982/73= 534( Digit sum is 3)
the digit sum of 38982 (3+8+9+8+2) i.e 3
73= digit sum is 10 i.e. 1
3/1=3(LHS)
LHS=RHS

2. (4848/24)*11-222= 2000
here denominator digit sum is 2+4=6
here digital sum can’t apply directly
better to divide first to eliminate denominator
(4848/24)= 202
now apply digit sum
202*11-222= 4*2-6=2(LHS)
For RHS= 2000= 2.
Note- Digital sum method is not used in the approximation

Do it Yourself-
 Some example where digit sum is very helpful 
1. 35% of 60% of 3/5*27500
1. 3345
2. 3355
3. 3465
4. 4361

2. 48% of 4800+24% of 1260
1. 2606.40
2. 2556.65
3. 2566.56