Multiplication Tricks for Speedy Calculation

Learning tables is one heck of a task for students, here are some simple multiplication tricks that can help you do calculations faster.

Learning mathematics table is not that hard, its just a matter of remembering some tricks and practice them to be pro in multiplications. Multiplication is an important aspect to solve questions in bank examinations as it holds questions of simplification and approximation. One can save score good marks and sufficient time to solve tricky and time taking problems like data interpretation if multiplication problems are solved correctly in a minimum of time. In case, you stuck on multiplication, you will not only lose time but marks also. Going back to basic you were supposed to learn the tables either in rhymes form or cramming. However, these tricks can make learning more dynamic and will take you ahead in the competition. 

Coronavirus Case Count in India Success Story Different Types of Bank Loans in India SBI PO Prime 2020 Online Test Series

You can practice on these tricks and learn tables by your heart in this lockdown period: 

About Course:

"Did you Know? In this pack you will get All new content we launch in the next 1 months"
 

This is the most recommended and NRA-CET ready Pack!
 
Use Code 'DREAM' to avail at the best price today

This package Includes IBPS PO Study Material -  Subscribe Now

About Bank Mahapack
If you are preparing for more than 1 Banking & Insurance exams then this is the pack we recommend you buy.

It is most cost-effective and you get access to 100% digital content for Bank & Insurance exams on Adda247.

Banking & Insurance Exams Covered in this Pack

Additionally, you can crack any private bank job exam with content in this pack.

 

Bank & Insurance Mahapack Highlights 

  • Structured course content
  • Recorded classes available if you miss any live class
  • Previous Years’ Papers of all upcoming exams.
  • Full Length Mocks based on the latest pattern with detailed solutions (video solutions for certain topics)
  • Topic level knowledge tests
  • Strategy sessions, time management & Preparation tips from the experts

 

Validity: 1 Month

Bank Maha Pack
  1. Unlimited Live Classes & Recorded Video Courses
  2. Unlimited Tests and eBooks
  3. 1 Lakh+ Selections
Validity
  1. 9 Months
  2. 3 Months
  3. 15 Months
  4. 27 Months
  5. 1 Month
4699 522/month
BUY NOW

Table sheet for single-digit numbers:

This is the oldest and quite effective trick to learn tables on your fingertips. For many of you, this might be boring or tiring technique but this could be quiet helpful for bigger calculations and problems. Doing repetitive practice of this table could help you to solve multiplication problems within seconds. For example: Have a look at the 9*9 square box depicted below to learn shortcuts for single-digit multiplication. 

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9
2 4 6 8 10 12 14 16 18
3 6 9 12 15 18 21 24 27
4 8 12 16 20 24 28 32 36
5 10 15 20 25 30 35 40 45
6 12 18 24 30 36 42 48 54
7 14 21 28 35 42 49 56 63
8 16 24 32 40 48 54 64 72
9 18 27 36 45 54 63 72 81

 

Multiplication of two-digit numbers and one-digit numbers:

Students find it difficult to remember the answer for tables of double-digit and single-digit numbers. For this, you will require the basic table given in the point-1. To explain it in a better way we have to use some examples to understand the shortcut:

Let us try 15 X 8

  1. Multiply one-digit number with 10, i.e. 8 X 10 which equals 80
  2. Now multiple unit digit of the double-digit number by the one-digit number, i.e. 5 X 8 which equals 40. 
  3. Now add the results of point A and B, i.e. 80+40= 120
  4. The answer to 15X8=120
Coronavirus Case Count Coronavirus Do’s & Don’ts List of Exams Postponed Timeline of India’s Response
Precautions You Should Take Govt. Jobs for Graduates Corona Relief Package Highest Paying Govt Jobs

Multiplication of two-digit with two-digit numbers

Multiplying two-digit numbers could be tricky, for this you should follow the steps below given example:

Let’s try it with 19 X 15

  1. Choose any one number from the two given above, and multiply it by 10, i.e. 19X10=190
  2. Now multiple unit digit of the other number with 10, i.e. 5X10=50
  3. Multiple unit digits of both numbers, i.e. 9X5=45
  4. Sum values of all three points A, B, and C= 190+50+45=285
  5. The answer to 19X15=285

Base Method Near 100

a) When both number Greater than 100

Eg1. 110*115

Step 1- multiplication of 15*10=150

Step 2- cross addition – 110+15 or 115+10= 125

Step 3- base is 100 multiplying the step 2 by 100= 12500

step 4- add step 1 and step 3= 12500+150= 12650

b) When both number less than 100

Eg2. 93*98

Step1-Multiplication of (-2*-7)= +14

Step2 -Now add (-2) to 93 or (-7) to 98= 91

Step3- step 2*100= 9100{as Base is 100}

Step4- 9100+14= 9114

c) When one number greater than 100 and other is less than 100

Eg3. 95*105

Step1-Multiplication of (-5*5)= -025

Step2 -Now add (5) to 95 or (-5) to 105= 100

Step3- step 2*100= { Base is 100}

Step4- 10000-25=9975

You can try with other examples to make yourself frequent and quick in these tricks. Quarantine is a golden chance for you to give more time to make your multiplication more accurate. 

Click Here to Register for Bank Exams 2020 Preparation Material

Also read,

What is a Debenture? Credit Rating Agencies in India IMF releases “World Economic Outlook”